Saratoga Advantage Trust Technology & Communications Portfolio v. Marvell Technology Group, Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Saratoga Advantage Trust Technology & Communications Portfolio
Defendant: Marvell Technology Group, Ltd., Sehat Sutardja, Weili Dai, Juergen Gromer, John G. Kassakian, Arturo Krueger, Randhir Thakur, Michael Rashkin and Sukhi Nagesh
Case Number: 5:2015cv04881
Filed: October 23, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 31 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
August 5, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING THE AUGUST 19, 2016 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, granting 44 . 8/19/2016 Initial Case Management Conference is reset to 9/30/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 8/5/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
February 5, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 36 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule and Continue Hearing Date filed by Marvell Technology Group, Ltd. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/5/2016. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
January 14, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting re 50 (in 5:15-cv-05447-RMW) Stipulation Continuing Initial Case Management Conference and Setting Dates for Filing of a Consolidated Complaint and Responses thereo, filed by Marvell Technology Group LTD. It is hereby ordered that after the Lead Plaintiff is appointed by the Court, Lead Plaintiff shall file and serve a consolidated complaint by 3/18/2016. Defendants response to the consolidated complaint shall be filed by 4/29/2016. If Defendants file motions to dismiss the consolidated complaint, Lead Plaintiff's opposition or oppositions shall be due by 6/10/2016, Defendants' replies shall be due by 7/15/2016. Any hearing on Defendants' motions to dismiss shall be noticed for no earlier than 7/29/2 016. The initial Case Management Conference currently set for 1/22/2016 43 is continued to 8/19/2016 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed by 8/9/2016. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/14/2016.(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2016)
December 21, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying 13 Motion to Remand; finding as moot 23 Motion for Leave to File (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saratoga Advantage Trust Technology & Communications Portfolio v. Marvell Technology Group, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saratoga Advantage Trust Technology & Communications Portfolio
Represented By: Mark L. Knutson
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Krinsk
Represented By: William Richard Restis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvell Technology Group, Ltd.
Represented By: Jason Frank Lake
Represented By: Harry Arthur Olivar, Jr.
Represented By: Valerie Suzanne Roddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sehat Sutardja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weili Dai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juergen Gromer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John G. Kassakian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arturo Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randhir Thakur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Rashkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sukhi Nagesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?