Johnson v. Quantum Learning Network, Inc.

Plaintiff: Trevor Johnson
Defendant: Quantum Learning Network, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv05013
Filed: October 30, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 27, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part 55 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 59 Motion for Settlement. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
August 30, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 45 Motion for Preliminary Approval Without Prejudice. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2016)
August 22, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 44 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2016)
August 12, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 39 Motion for Settlement Without Prejudice. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
April 18, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Case Schedule. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/18/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Quantum Learning Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Johnson
Represented By: Bryan Jeffrey Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quantum Learning Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?