Hughes v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Dazza Hughes
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., IQ Data International, Inc. and HSBC Bank USA, National Association
Case Number: 5:2015cv05118
Filed: November 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 54 IQD'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON FCRA CLAIM AND DENYING 54 IQD'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON CCRA CLAIM; DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER CCRA CLAIM; AND DISMISSING CCRA CLAIM. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/22/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
July 11, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 36 DEFENDANT IQ DATA INTERNATIONAL, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/11/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
March 28, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 20 DEFENDANT IQ DATA INTERNATIONAL'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/28/2016.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
March 2, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/2/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
February 10, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING HEARING ON 20 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 2/10/2016. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dazza Hughes
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IQ Data International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?