Mendoza v. Fonseca McElroy Grinding Co. Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Leopoldo Pena Mendoza
Defendant: Fonseca McElroy Grinding Co., Inc and Granite Rock Company
Case Number: 5:2015cv05143
Filed: November 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/12/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
November 28, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON CROSS MOITONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William H. Orrick granting 26 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
October 17, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 47 STIPULATION to Extend Fact and Expert Discovery Cut-Off Dates. Fact discovery cutoff: 1/31/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/17/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
February 24, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/24/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
February 8, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION granting 18 STIPULATION to Continue Initial CMC. Case Management Statement due by 2/16/2016. Case Management Conference continued to 2/23/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/08/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
January 15, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/15/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza v. Fonseca McElroy Grinding Co. Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leopoldo Pena Mendoza
Represented By: Huy Ngoc Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fonseca McElroy Grinding Co., Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite Rock Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?