Heifetz v. Texas Turkeys, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Shelby Gail Heifetz
Defendant: Texas Turkeys, Inc. and Viscovich San Antonio, LLC
Case Number: 5:2015cv05726
Filed: December 14, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. The parties are ordered to appear on 11/10/2016 at 10:00 AM to show cause why the case should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). On or before 11/3/2016, the parties shall file a joint statement in response to the Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/31/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
July 26, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking 33 Stipulation to Dismiss Action. This action is not dismissed. The parties are advised that any subsequent stipulation for dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) must be consistent with this order. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/26/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
July 6, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. NO APPEARANCE NEEDED and Counsel to contact CourtCall to cancel telephonic appearance 30 . Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on July 6, 2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
June 2, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The court schedules this action for a Case Management Conference at 10:00 a.m. on 7/7/2016. The parties shall file Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before 6/30/2016. Any motion to compel the inspection of property under General Order No. 56 is hereby REFERRED to the assigned magistrate judge. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/2/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
May 24, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. If Plaintiff does not, by 5/31/2016, file or cause to be filed a Notice of Settlement, a Notice of Need for Mediation as indicated in Section 7 of General Order No. 56, or otherwise demonstrate good cause in writing why this c ase should not be dismissed, the court will dismiss the action with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/24/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heifetz v. Texas Turkeys, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Gail Heifetz
Represented By: Irakli M. Karbelashvili
Represented By: Irene Lenislav Karbelashvili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Turkeys, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine Mary Corfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viscovich San Antonio, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?