Elofson v. Bivens et al
Plaintiff: Greg Elofson
Defendant: Stephanie Bivens, Stephanie Mccollum, Lawrence Scaringelli, Paul Theut, Steven Mudd, Pam Dougherty-Elofson and Community Memorial Hospital of Ventura County
Case Number: 5:2015cv05761
Filed: December 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER REVOKING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS (addressing 165 ). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/9/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2017)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER GRANTING 153 DEFENDANT MCCOLLUM'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/6/2017.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER DENYING 154 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRANSCRIPT AT GOVERNMENT EXPENSE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/19/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER GRANTING 48 , 51 , 70 , 82 , 102 , 106 MOTIONS TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/13/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER DENYING 145 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECUSAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 455. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/12/2016.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2016)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER GRANTING 126 DEFENDANT SCARINGELLI'S APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/27/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER DENYING 80 PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY EX PARTE MOTION TO COMPEL AUTOPSY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/2/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING 54 DEFENDANT STEVEN MUDD'S AMENDED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/18/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING 28 MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/9/2016.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING 24 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/29/2016. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING 8 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL; DENYING 20 PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; AND GRANTING 18 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. Amended complaint due on or before 3/9/2016. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 3 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing; Order to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not Be Dismissed. Show-cause hearing set for February 16, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. Show-cause response due by February 12, 2016. The clerk mailed a copy of this order to Greg Elofson at 325 Sharon Park Drive #456, Menlo Park, CA 94025. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elofson v. Bivens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Elofson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Bivens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Mccollum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Scaringelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Theut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Mudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Dougherty-Elofson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Memorial Hospital of Ventura County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?