United States of America v. Kumar et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Manoj Kumar, Bhavikaben M Brahmbhatt and Bhavika's Hospitality, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv05780
Filed: December 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting 54 Motion to Relate Case.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
December 20, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting in Part and Denying in Part 23 Motion for Summary Judgment. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
July 20, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 07/20/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
April 20, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 04/20/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Kumar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Christina Lauren Goebelsmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manoj Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bhavikaben M Brahmbhatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bhavika's Hospitality, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?