Randall Wallis v. CitiMortgage, Inc., a New York Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Randall Wallis
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc., a New York Corporation, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for the Structured Asset Securities Corporation Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-6XS and NBS Default Services, LLC, a Texas Limited Liability Company
Case Number: 5:2015cv05824
Filed: December 18, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION 38 . Further Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Updated Case Management Statement due by 6/29/2016. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/25/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
April 6, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING RE: HELENE WALLIS. Plaintiff must submit additional briefing by 4/15/2016. Defendant may respond by 4/22/2016. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/6/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
March 29, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MARCH 30 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/29/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
December 21, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT. Counsel shall participate in a telephone conference to be schedule by the ADR Unit by no later than 1/29/2016. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/21/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randall Wallis v. CitiMortgage, Inc., a New York Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Wallis
Represented By: September Joy Katje
Represented By: Rex John Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc., a New York Corporation
Represented By: James Christopher Magid
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for the Structured Asset Securities Corporation Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-6XS
Represented By: James Christopher Magid
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBS Default Services, LLC, a Texas Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?