Microsoft Corporation v. Corel Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Defendant: Corel Corporation and Corel Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv05836
Filed: December 18, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2017 216 Opinion or Order of the Court REDACTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/11/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
October 17, 2017 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 203 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO BRING ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/17/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
June 30, 2017 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 190 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/30/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 13, 2017 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/13/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
January 12, 2017 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 49 COREL'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE DEFENSE OF EXPRESS LICENSE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/12/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
January 10, 2017 151 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER(JURY)- SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS AS TO DEADLINES: The Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 1/12/2017 is VACATED - NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY and the parties are ordered to comply with the schedule set forth in the order. Joint Final Pr etrial Conference Statement, Motions In Limine and Exchange of Exhibits due by 1/11/2018. Voir Dire Questions, Proposed Jury Instructions, and Proposed Jury Verdict Forms due 1/15/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/25/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroo m 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 2/6/2018 09:00 AM, Jury Trial set for 2/6/2018 01:30 PM. Jury Trial 2/7, 2/9, 2/13, and 2/14/2018 09:00 AM (deliberations). Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/10/2017. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
August 8, 2016 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference scheduled for 8/11/2016 is CONTINUED to 9:00 a.m. on 9/1/2016 to coincide with the motion currently scheduled for hearing on that date and time. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/8/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Microsoft Corporation v. Corel Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan Joseph Lamberson
Represented By: Olga Ivanovna May
Represented By: Frank Everett Scherkenbach
Represented By: John Winston Thornburgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corel Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?