Dantes v. Stanford Hospital and Clinics

Plaintiff: Marie Encar Arnold Dantes
Defendant: Stanford Hospital and Clinics
Case Number: 5:2015cv05951
Filed: December 22, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court Order of Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/24/2017. The clerk shall close the file. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
March 10, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/10/2017. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/18/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Fifth Floor, San Jose. Show Cause Response due by 4/11/2017. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
July 12, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION 52 . Further Settlement Conference set for 8/16/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/12/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
June 22, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court Order directing parties to proceed with settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/22/16. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
May 27, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE set for 6/6/2016. The Court will reschedule the conference once counsel is appointed. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/27/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 26, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting Motion to Appoint Counsel for Limited-Scope Representation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/26/16. (hrllc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dantes v. Stanford Hospital and Clinics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Encar Arnold Dantes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanford Hospital and Clinics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?