Hoko v. Transit America Services, Inc

Plaintiff: Sione S. Hoko
Defendant: Transit America Services, Inc
Case Number: 5:2015cv06211
Filed: December 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. The parties are ordered to appear on 12/1/2016 at 10:00 AM to show cause why the case should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). On or before 11/23/2016, the parties shall file a joint statement in response to the Order to Show Cause. All other pretrial deadlines and hearing dates are VACATED and any pending motions are TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/18/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
July 27, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE set for 8/2/2016. The parties shall contact this Court to reschedule the conference once counsel is appointed. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/27/2016. (Pro Se party notified via email) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
May 11, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Pursuant to ADR Local Rule 7-2, the above-entitled case is referred to Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins for a settlement conference to occur no later than 90 days from the date this order is filed. The parties are instructed to contact Judge Cousins' Courtroom Deputy to arrange a date and time for the conference. The prior order referring this case to mediation (Dkt. No. 23) is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/11/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
January 20, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Re: Consideration of Related Case Status. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 01/20/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoko v. Transit America Services, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sione S. Hoko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transit America Services, Inc
Represented By: Clarice C. Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?