Salinas v. Palo Alto University et al

Plaintiff: Oscar Salinas
Defendant: Palo Alto University, Allen Calvin, James Breckenridge, Robert Russell, Sandra Macias and Amanda Fanniff
Case Number: 5:2015cv06336
Filed: December 31, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2017 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 65 defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 88 plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk shall enter judgment and close this file. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
May 2, 2017 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 66 plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2017)
December 16, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 62 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 2. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
August 16, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying as moot 37 plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 39 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
June 1, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 16 defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Amended complaint due by 6/16/2016. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
April 26, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court INTERIM ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Defendants' supplemental briefing due by 5/3/2016. Plaintiff's supplemental briefing due by 5/10/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/26/2016. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salinas v. Palo Alto University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palo Alto University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Calvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Breckenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Macias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Fanniff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?