Garcia v. County of Santa Clara

Plaintiff: Ruben Garcia
Defendant: County of Santa Clara, Dario and Le
Case Number: 5:2016cv00012
Filed: January 4, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulated Protective Order As Modified re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Phillip Abecendario, Le, County of Santa Clara, Ruben Garcia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/29/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
July 25, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, granting 25 . Signed by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 7/25/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
April 19, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 16 Joint Case Management Statement. It is hereby ordered pursuant to the parties request that the Case Management Conference set for 4/29/2016 is continued to 7/1/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M . Whyte. The parties have agreed to mediation and that the case will not be in a posture to effectively mediate the case until after the pending criminal matter is complete. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/19/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. County of Santa Clara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Santa Clara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Garcia
Represented By: Robert Ross Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?