Leonard Cisneros et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Leonard G Cisneros and Gretel R. Cisneros
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2016cv00084
Filed: January 7, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 59 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Leonard G Cisneros, Gretel R. Cisneros. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/21/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
June 9, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [Reassigned Case]. Case Management Statement due by 7/22/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/9/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
May 10, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 18 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
January 11, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER re 6 by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 11, 2016 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
January 8, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES 16-cv-00084 NC and 13-cv-05020 PSG. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/8/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonard Cisneros et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard G Cisneros
Represented By: Nicole Cherones
Represented By: David L Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gretel R. Cisneros
Represented By: Nicole Cherones
Represented By: David L Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?