Feathers v. Bank of America , N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Mark Feathers
Defendant: Bank of America , N.A., Wells Fargo Bank and NBS Default Services, LLC
Case Number: 5:2016cv00086
Filed: January 7, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2017 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion to Dismiss; Setting Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 07/19/2017. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2017)
May 9, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Having reviewed the parties' Joint Case Management Conference Statement (Dkt. No. 55 ), the court has determined that a scheduling conference is premature at this time. Accordingly, the Case Mana gement Conference scheduled for 5/12/2016, is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on August 25, 2016. The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before 8/18/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/9/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016) Modified text on 5/9/2016 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/19/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
January 26, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Request for Continuance of Order to Show Cause. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing on the Order to Show Cause as to Why a Preliminary Injunction should not issue is continued to 11:00 a.m. on 2/18/2016. Defendants are to file written opposition to the motion no later than 4:00 p.m. on 2/9/2016. Plaintiff may file any reply not to exceed 6 pages by 2/15/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/26/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 21, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Plaintiff must, on or before 12:00 p.m. on 1/22/2016, file a new document or documents that are consistent with Rule 5-5. Failure to do so may result in the dissolution of the TRO and a summary denial of a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/21/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 14, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Signed by Judge Hon. Lucy H. Koh on 1/14/2016. (A copy of this order shall also be filed in Securities and Exchange Commission v. Small Business Capital Corp. et al, No. 12-CV-03237-EJD.(sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feathers v. Bank of America , N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Feathers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America , N.A.
Represented By: David E. Pinch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: David E. Pinch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBS Default Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?