Chen, et al v. Fleetcor Technologies Inc.

Plaintiff: Naidong Chen and Fnu Manindra
Defendant: Fleetcor Technologies Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv00135
Filed: January 8, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2017 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 83 Motion in Limine; denying 84 Motion in Limine; denying 85 Motion in Limine; denying 86 Motion in Limine; denying 88 Motion in Limine; denying 89 Motion in Limine; denying 90 Motion in Limine; denying 91 Motion in Limine; denying 92 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion in Limine. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2017)
March 23, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting in Part and Denying in Part 55 Motion for Summary Judgment. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
November 23, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re: Dkt. No. 47 , Discovery Dispute Joint Report #1. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
June 22, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 22, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
May 10, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT ENE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 5\10\2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
March 23, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 23, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen, et al v. Fleetcor Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleetcor Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Susan Furr
Represented By: Karleen J Green
Represented By: Elisabeth A. Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naidong Chen
Represented By: Sebastian Lamar Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fnu Manindra
Represented By: Sebastian Lamar Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?