Enger v. Allstate Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Linda Enger
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, Laura Gallagher, Deanne Lashbrook and Warren Wood
Case Number: 5:2016cv00136
Filed: January 8, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/25/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
March 21, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 28 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 21, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
January 27, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 7 Stipulation To Extend Deadlines as to 6 MOTION to Dismiss, 8 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 2/19/2016. Replies due by 3/11/2016. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/27/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016) Modified on 1/27/2016 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/21/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enger v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Enger
Represented By: Robert A. Buccola
Represented By: Steven Martin Campora
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: John R. Parker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Sonia Renee Martin
Represented By: Anna Shiran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Company
Represented By: Sonia Renee Martin
Represented By: Anna Shiran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Gallagher
Represented By: Sonia Renee Martin
Represented By: Anna Shiran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanne Lashbrook
Represented By: Sonia Renee Martin
Represented By: Anna Shiran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Wood
Represented By: Sonia Renee Martin
Represented By: Anna Shiran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?