Fleming v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Jonathan Benjamin Fleming
Defendant: Carolyn Colvin
Case Number: 5:2016cv00162
Filed: January 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 20 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 23 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
June 13, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Order to Show Cause and Extending Time for Service. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/13/16. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
May 18, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/18/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleming v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Benjamin Fleming
Represented By: Dolly Marlo Trompeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?