Tesla Motors, Inc v. Hoerbiger Automotive Comfort Systems, LLC et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Tesla Motors, Inc
Defendant: Hoerbiger Automotive Comfort Systems, LLC and Hoerbiger America Holding, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv00288
Filed: January 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2016 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Amir Q Amiri On Behalf Of Defendants Hoerbiger Automotive Comfort Systems, LLC and Hoerbiger America Holding, Inc. (Amiri, Amir) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 22 NOTICE of Appearance by David Craig Kiernan On Behalf Of Defendants Hoerbiger Automotive Comfort Systems, LLC and Hoerbiger America Holding, Inc. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 21 MOTION to Dismiss Partially Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) filed by Hoerbiger America Holding, Inc., Hoerbiger Automotive Comfort Systems, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 3/31/2016. Replies due by 4/7/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
February 16, 2016 20 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2016. Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 15, 2016 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tesla Motors, Inc re 1 Complaint, 7 Summons Issued HOERBIGER AMERICA HOLDING, INC. (Hammon, Patrick) (Filed on 2/15/2016)
February 15, 2016 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tesla Motors, Inc re 1 Complaint, 6 Summons Issued HOERBIGER AUTOMOTIVE COMFORT SYSTEMS, LLC (Hammon, Patrick) (Filed on 2/15/2016)
February 12, 2016 17 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings pursuant to Order of Recusal. Hon. Beth Labson Freeman no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 2/12/2016. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
February 12, 2016 16 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/12/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
February 11, 2016 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hoerbiger America Holding, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hoerbiger Kompressortechnik Holding GmbH, Corporate Parent Hoerbiger Holding AG for Hoerbiger America Holding, Inc.. (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
February 11, 2016 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hoerbiger Automotive Comfort Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hoerbiger America Holding, Inc., Corporate Parent Hoerbiger Kompressortechnik Holding GmbH, Corporate Parent Hoerbiger Holding AG for Hoerbiger Automotive Comfort Systems, LLC. (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
February 11, 2016 13 STIPULATION To Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint filed by Hoerbiger America Holding, Inc., Hoerbiger Automotive Comfort Systems, LLC. (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
February 3, 2016 12 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2016. Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. All other deadlines associated with the initial case management conference are adjusted accordingly. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
January 25, 2016 11 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 1/25/2016. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
January 22, 2016 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 22, 2016 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tesla Motors, Inc.. (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 20, 2016 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy S. Park on behalf of Tesla Motors, Inc. (Park, Amy) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 20, 2016 7 Summons Issued as to Hoerbiger America Holding, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 20, 2016 6 Summons Issued as to Hoerbiger Automotive Comfort Systems, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 20, 2016 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/12/2016. Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 20, 2016 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 2/3/2016. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 19, 2016 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Tesla Motors, Inc (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 19, 2016 2 Proposed Summons. (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 19, 2016 1 COMPLAINT against Hoerbiger America Holding, Inc., Hoerbiger Automotive Comfort Systems, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10142149.). Filed byTesla Motors, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 1/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tesla Motors, Inc v. Hoerbiger Automotive Comfort Systems, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tesla Motors, Inc
Represented By: Jack Patrick DiCanio
Represented By: Patrick Maben Hammon
Represented By: Amy S. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoerbiger Automotive Comfort Systems, LLC
Represented By: Jason S. McDonell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoerbiger America Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Jason S. McDonell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?