Vitalich v. The Bank of New York Mellon, fka Bank of New York, as Trustee

Appellant: John Jefferson Vitalich
Appellee: The Bank of New York Mellon, fka Bank of New York, as Trustee
Miscellaneous: Dennis Montali
Case Number: 5:2016cv00420
Filed: January 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING BANKRUPTCY COURT'S ORDER ON MOTION FOR AN ORDER CONFIRMING NO AUTOMATIC STAY IN EFFECT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/10/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2016) CC: USBC Judge and USBC Case Manager in San Jose. Modified on 8/10/2016 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 16 , 17 APPELLANT'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/20/2016.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 16, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR RESPONSE TO 16 , 17 APPELLANT'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL; AND SETTING MOTION FOR HEARING ON MAY 19, 2016, AT 10:00 AM. Responses due by 5/18/2016. Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
April 1, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 11 APPELLANT'S SECOND REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPENING BRIEF ON APPEAL. Appellant Brief due by 4/29/2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/1/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
February 29, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 5 APPELLANT'S REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPENING BRIEF ON APPEAL; AND MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Appellant Brief due by 3/30/2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/29/2016. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vitalich v. The Bank of New York Mellon, fka Bank of New York, as Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: John Jefferson Vitalich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Bank of New York Mellon, fka Bank of New York, as Trustee
Represented By: Javonne Michelle Phillips
Represented By: Kelly Marie Raftery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Dennis Montali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?