Nunes v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Washington Nunes
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, Equifax, Inc., WebBank and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2016cv00547
Filed: February 2, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. 1.The parties shall comply with the deadlines provided in the Case Management Order filed on 6/3/2016 42 . 2. The parties shall complete mediation by the deadline provided in the order filed on 7/1/201 6 50 . 3. The Further Case Management Conference scheduled for 8/4/2016 is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on 10/6/2016. The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before 9/29/2016. The motion to appear by telephone 53 is TERMINATED as moot. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/1/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
July 1, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On 6/29/2016, the court issued an order requiring Plaintiff and Defendant Bank of America, N.A. to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed after they failed to timely file one of the forms addressin g ADR. Dkt. No. 47 . In light of the stipulation filed on 7/1/2016 (Dkt. No. 49 ), the Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED and the hearing scheduled for 7/7/2016, is VACATED. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 7/1/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 29, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 7/1/2016. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/7/2016 10:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/29/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
May 25, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 38 Stipulation filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank. JPMorgan Chase Bank terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/25/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
April 15, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 32 Notice of Settlement between Plaintiff and Chase Bank USA (Other) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank. All pending dates and filing requirementspertaining to Chase be vacated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/15/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunes v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington Nunes
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine Anne Neben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank
Represented By: Stephen Julian Newman
Represented By: Julieta Stepanyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WebBank
Represented By: Kristen Mah Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?