Kari Roberts v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kari Roberts
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, CitiGroup, Inc., TD Bank USA, National Association, Wells Fargo Card Services, Inc. and U.S. Bancorp
Case Number: 5:2016cv00554
Filed: February 2, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT TD BANK USA, N.A. PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(A)(1), granting 76 . Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 7/28/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
May 20, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 59 Stipulation for Dismissal of Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank. JPMorgan Chase Bank terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/20/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 10, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 56 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (of Defendant Citigroup, Inc.)filed by Kari Roberts. CitiGroup, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/10/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
April 15, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 47 Notice of Settlement between Plaintiff and Chase Bank USA (Other) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank. All pending dates and filing requirementspertaining to Chase be vacated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/15/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kari Roberts v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kari Roberts
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine Anne Neben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Lauren E. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank
Represented By: Stephen Julian Newman
Represented By: Julieta Stepanyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiGroup, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank USA, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Card Services, Inc.
Represented By: Courtney C Wenrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bancorp
Represented By: Alexandra Whitworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?