Larson et al v. Mattos et al
Plaintiff: Charles Larson and Project Sentinel, Inc.
Defendant: Kim Mattos, Bernie Wilder and Milias Apartments, LP
Case Number: 5:2016cv00726
Filed: February 12, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING 23 MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/21/2016. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REQUESTING FILING OF PROOFS OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/13/2016. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 17 Case Management Conference - Initial, Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions set for 11/17/2016 at 9:00 am. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2017 01:30 PM. Jury Selection set for 2/27/2017 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Jury Trial set for 2/27/2017, 2/28/2017, 3/1/2017, 3/2/2017 and 3/3/2017 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 06/16/2016. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larson et al v. Mattos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Larson
Represented By: Nadia Aziz
Represented By: Kyra Ann Kazantzis
Represented By: Annette D. Kirkham
Represented By: Matthew Frederick Warren
Represented By: Thomas Philip Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Project Sentinel, Inc.
Represented By: Nadia Aziz
Represented By: Kyra Ann Kazantzis
Represented By: Annette D. Kirkham
Represented By: Matthew Frederick Warren
Represented By: Thomas Philip Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Mattos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernie Wilder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milias Apartments, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?