Inventergy, Inc. v. Sonus Networks Inc

Plaintiff: Inventergy, Inc.
Defendant: Sonus Networks Inc
Case Number: 5:2016cv00918
Filed: February 24, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 35 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Inventergy, Inc. Motion terminated: 29 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) filed by Sonus Networks Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/8/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
June 7, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 33 to Stay Pending Deadlines filed by Sonus Networks Inc. Case Management Statement due by 7/21/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/28/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion to Dismiss Hearing reset for 7/28/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/7/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
April 29, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DEADLINE TO ANSWER COMPLAINT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE granting 20 ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 5/31/2016. Case Management Conference set for 6/7/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/29/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inventergy, Inc. v. Sonus Networks Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inventergy, Inc.
Represented By: Chris L Holm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonus Networks Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?