Arista Networks, Inc. v. Cisco Systems Inc.

Plaintiff: Arista Networks, Inc.
Defendant: Cisco Systems Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv00923
Filed: February 24, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2016 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 48 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY CASE AND DENYING AS MOOT MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/23/2016. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
August 17, 2016 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING 47 , 59 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/17/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2016)
July 15, 2016 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON 89 CISCO'S MOTION FOR RELIEF. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/15/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arista Networks, Inc. v. Cisco Systems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arista Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Susan Abouchar Creighton
Represented By: Brian L. Ferrall
Represented By: Jonathan M. Jacobson
Represented By: Michael S Kwun
Represented By: Nicholas David Marais
Represented By: Andrea Christina Nill Sanchez
Represented By: Chul Pak
Represented By: Ashok Ramani
Represented By: David Reichenberg
Represented By: Scott Andrew Sher
Represented By: David Jason Silbert
Represented By: Bradley T Tennis
Represented By: Robert Addy Van Nest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cisco Systems Inc.
Represented By: Tom BenGera
Represented By: Amy H Candido
Represented By: John M. Desmarais
Represented By: Alan S. Kellman
Represented By: Tamir Packin
Represented By: Michael Rothschild Rhodes, Rhode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?