Arrizon v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., et al

Plaintiff: Guadalupe Arrizon
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Clear Recon Corp. and World Savings Bank
Case Number: 5:2016cv00959
Filed: February 26, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Dismissing Case with Prejudice for Failure to Prosecute. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 05/26/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016) **THE CLERK SHALL CLOSE THE CASE FILE** Modified on 5/26/2016 (sms, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Judge Lucy Koh Granting 8 Motion to Dismiss; Order Adopting 18 Report and Recommendation; and Order to Show Cause. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
April 4, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO GUADALUPE ARRIZON TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS. Re: Dkt. No. 8 . If Arrizon does not file an opposition to the motion by 4/13/2016, the Court will recommend the dismissal of her case. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/4/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arrizon v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Arrizon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Recon Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?