Hurtado v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Adrienne Hurtado
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 5:2016cv01075
Filed: March 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Retirement and Survivors Benefits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REMANDING FOR FURTHER ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEEDINGS. Re: Dkt. Nos. 18 , 23 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR STIPULATED STATEMENT OF FACTS. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/28/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REASSIGN CASE. As all parties have consented to the assignment of this case to a magistrate judge for all purposes including trial and entry of judgment (Dkt. Nos. 9 , 11 ), the Clerk shall reassign it to an available magistrate judge. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/13/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE: CONSENT/DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. In order to determine the position of both parties on this issue, the court orders Plaintiff to file a similar document indicating either consent or declination to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge on or before 4/14/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/7/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurtado v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrienne Hurtado
Represented By: Lisa Susan Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?