Spencer vs. Carolyn W. Colvin

Plaintiff: Richard Kenneth Spencer
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 5:2016cv01108
Filed: March 4, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR STIPULATED STATEMENT OF FACTS. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/15/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
April 13, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REASSIGN CASE. As all parties have consented to the assignment of this case to a magistrate judge for all purposes including trial and entry of judgment (Dkt. Nos. 8 , 10 ), the Clerk shall reassign it to an available magistrate judge. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/13/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
April 7, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CONSENT/DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. In order to determine the position of both parties on this issue, the court orders Plaintiff to file a similar document indicating either consent or declination to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge on or before 4/14/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/7/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer vs. Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Kenneth Spencer
Represented By: Wesley Klimczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?