Funai Electric Co., Ltd. et al v. LSI Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Funai Electric Co., Ltd., Funai Corporation, Inc., P&F USA, Inc. and Funai Service Corporation
Defendant: LSI Corporation, Agere Systems LLC and Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) Pte.Ltd.
Case Number: 5:2016cv01210
Filed: March 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2017 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS IN U.S. PATENT NO. 5,870,087. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/23/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
September 25, 2017 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 104 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE BY ROBERT T. RAZZANO. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/25/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
March 27, 2017 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 48 MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/27/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
June 16, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 36 JOINT MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF REGARDING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/15/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/16/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
May 31, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING DATE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (granting 27 ). Case Management Statement due by 7/14/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/31/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Funai Electric Co., Ltd. et al v. LSI Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Funai Electric Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Roger Scott Feldmann
Represented By: Kevin W. Kirsch
Represented By: Jonathan Lawrence Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Funai Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Roger Scott Feldmann
Represented By: Kevin W. Kirsch
Represented By: Jonathan Lawrence Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P&F USA, Inc.
Represented By: Roger Scott Feldmann
Represented By: Kevin W. Kirsch
Represented By: Jonathan Lawrence Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Funai Service Corporation
Represented By: Roger Scott Feldmann
Represented By: Kevin W. Kirsch
Represented By: Jonathan Lawrence Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSI Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agere Systems LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) Pte.Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?