Casenas v. Santa Clara Valley Transportation Authority et al

Plaintiff: Erlindo Casenas
Defendant: Santa Clara Valley Transportation Authority, Nurai Fernandez and SEIU Local 521
Case Number: 5:2016cv01212
Filed: March 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. The Status Conference scheduled for 7/21/2016 is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on 8/25/2016. The parties shall file a Joint Status Conference Statement on or before 8/18/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/14/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
June 21, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The court schedules this action for a Status Conference at 10:00 a.m. on 7/21/2016. The parties shall file a Joint Status Conference Statement which, inter alia, provides an update on the anticipated settlement and ensuing dismissal, on or before 7/14/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/21/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
June 10, 2016 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The court issues the instant OSC requiring that Plaintiff, no later than June 17, 2016, either: (1) file documents to show proof of service of the Summons and Complaint on defendants; or (2) explain in writing why service has not been accomplished. No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. The Case Management Conference scheduled for 6/16/2016 is VACATED and will be reset, if necessary, upon resolution of the issue addressed herein. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/10/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casenas v. Santa Clara Valley Transportation Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erlindo Casenas
Represented By: W. James Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Clara Valley Transportation Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurai Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEIU Local 521
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?