Gallegos v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Plaintiff: Lisa Gallegos
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 5:2016cv01268
Filed: March 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART 43 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT UNDER RULE 52; ISSUING FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW UNDER RULE 52; AND DENYING 42 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT UNDER RULE 52. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/5/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
April 3, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 39 MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/3/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
January 3, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 28 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/3/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
June 16, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 21 Case Management Conference - Initial, Motion Hearing reserved for 05/05/2017 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 06/16/2016. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallegos v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Gallegos
Represented By: Terrence J. Coleman
Represented By: Michael James Quirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Cindy Mekari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?