Sumotext Corp. -v- Zoove, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Sumotext Corp.
Defendant: Zoove, Inc. and Virtual Hold Technology, LLC
Case Number: 5:2016cv01370
Filed: March 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2017 197 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 196 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY POOYA SHOGHI PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/16/2017.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2017)
August 11, 2017 190 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 185 , 187 PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/11/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
June 26, 2017 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 123 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND 142 , 146 , 148 DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/26/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
March 6, 2017 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 160 SUMOTEXT CORPORATION'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/6/2017.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
January 10, 2017 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 125 PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/10/2017.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
November 3, 2016 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 71 MOTION TO DISMISS BROUGHT BY DEFENDANTS ZOOVE AND VHT, AND JOINED BY DEFENDANTS STARSTEVE 77 AND MBLOX 80 , WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/3/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
August 1, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELEASING FUNDS DEPOSITED IN THE COURT REGISTRY TO PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/1/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
June 14, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 56 JOINT MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING AND RESCHEDULING DEADLINES. Case Management Statement due by 7/21/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/28/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/14/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
May 24, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (granting 42 ). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/24/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 5, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY re Sumotext Corp. (granting 40 ). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/5/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
April 26, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 15 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; AND DISSOLVING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/26/2016.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
April 12, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING 27 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Lason Freeman on 4/12/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
March 31, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 15 APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; AND SETTING HEARING ON 15 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Plaintiff's supplemental brief due 4/4/2016. Defendants' supplemental brief due 4/11/2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/31/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 25, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR OPPOSITION TO 15 APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Responses due by 3/28/2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/25/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sumotext Corp. -v- Zoove, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sumotext Corp.
Represented By: Renee Beltranena Bea
Represented By: Adam Seth Cashman
Represented By: Kathryn Kelly Erno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoove, Inc.
Represented By: David S. Bloch
Represented By: Alexandra B McTague
Represented By: Robert Benard Pringle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virtual Hold Technology, LLC
Represented By: David S. Bloch
Represented By: Alexandra B McTague
Represented By: Robert Benard Pringle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?