Johnson v. Taormino et al

Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Milton P. Taormino, Joyce L. Taormino and Joyplace QSR, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv01491
Filed: March 27, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court Order to John Hill to Show Cause re: Sanctions signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/13/2017. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/27/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Fifth Floor, San Jose. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
April 18, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court Order to Show Cause Re: Settlement signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/18/2017. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/13/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Fifth Floor, San Jose. Show Cause Response due by 6/6/2017. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2017)
October 31, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 26 Stipulation to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default without prejudice. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
October 13, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Order to Show Cause Why Answer Should Not Be Stricken signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/13/2016. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/22/2016 at 10:00 AM, Courtroom 2, Fifth Floor, San Jose. Show Cause Response due by 11/15/2016. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Taormino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr.
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Mark Dee Potter
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milton P. Taormino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce L. Taormino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyplace QSR, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?