Biggs v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Victoria Biggs
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, Ally Financial, Inc., Bank of America, N.A., Credit One Bank, National Association, Harley-Davidson Credit Corp., and Tidewater Finance Company
Case Number: 5:2016cv01507
Filed: March 28, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2017 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff and counsel for Plaintiff are ordered to appear on 1/19/2017 at 11:00 a.m. to show cause why the court should not impose any and all appropriate sanctions on Plaintiff and her counsel, or any of them, for willful dis obedience of a court order. Plaintiff and counsel for Plaintiff may file a response to this order demonstrating good cause why sanctions should not be imposed on or before 1/12/2017. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/5/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
October 21, 2016 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 76 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/21/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
September 22, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion to Dismiss. The hearing scheduled for 9/29/2016 is VACATED. Any amended complaint must be filed on or before 10/13/2016. The motion to appear by telephone 69 is TERMINATED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/22/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2016)
August 31, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT. If Plaintiff does not, by 9/6/2016, either (1) file a request for the Clerk to enter default against Defendant Credit One Bank, National Association, or (2) demonstrate good cause in writing why the claims should not be dismissed, the court will dismiss them with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/31/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
August 15, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. If Plaintiff does not, no later than 8/19, 2016, either: (1) file documents to show proof of service of the Summons and Complaint on Tidewater; or (2) explain in writing why service has not been accomplished, the court will dismiss Tidewater. No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/15/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biggs v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Biggs
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra Alford McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Debra A. Miller
Represented By: Lauren E. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Catherine Kamka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Raagini Rashmi Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit One Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley-Davidson Credit Corp.,
Represented By: Anthony Q Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tidewater Finance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?