Ruben Garcia et al v. County of Santa Clara et al

Plaintiff: Ruben Garcia, Pedro Abrajan, Roman Aguilar, Tina Banks, Michelle Benavides, Tricia Benavides, Victoria Callaghan, Kim Co, Maylene De Jesus, Anna Fernandez, Veronica Garcia, Gabriel Garza, Martha Guadalupe, Francisco Guerreo, Puresa Jacobo, Gigi Lau, Maria Leon-Rodriguez, Angelica Longa, Aerin Mai, Nghia Mai, Moti Marga, Cristina Martinez, Ana Laura Murillo, Tam Nguyen, Tu Tran Nguyen, Angelica Pedrozo, Maria Perez, Lili Phu, Rosario Silva-Aguilar, Tara Terrazas, Stacy Tonnu, Thucuc Tran, Rita Ursua, Virginia Valdez, Anna Vo and Vickie Vu-Lam
Defendant: County of Santa Clara and Service Employees International Union Local 521
Case Number: 5:2016cv01725
Filed: April 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The Clerk shall close this file. Motions terminated: 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Rosario Silva-Aguilar, Stacy Tonnu, Virginia Va ldez, Nghia Mai, Tricia Benavides, Michelle Benavides, Veronica Garcia, Gabriel Garza, Tina Banks, Puresa Jacobo, Vickie Vu-Lam, Angelica Longa, Gigi Lau, Kim Co, Anna Vo, Martha Guadalupe, Aerin Mai, Angelica Pedrozo, Victoria Callag han, Tam Nguyen, Rita Ursua, Lili Phu, Maria Perez, Tara Terrazas, Francisco Guerreo, Thucuc Tran, Tu Tran Nguyen, Roman Aguilar, Cristina Martinez, Anna Fernandez, Moti Marga, Maylene De Jesus, Pedro Abrajan, Ruben Garcia, Maria Leon-Rodriguez, Ana Laura Murillo. ***ALL Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/22/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
April 13, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. At the request of Plaintiffs counsel, the Status Conference scheduled for 4/14/2016 is CONTINUED to 11:00 a.m. on 4/28/2016. The parties shall file a Joint Status Conference Statement which, inter alia, provide s an update as to any jurisdictional issues and whether Plaintiff intends to pursue a temporary restraining order in this action, on or before 4/21/2016. In light of this continuance, the court will not take further action on the pending motion for temporary restraining order unless notified otherwise by Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/13/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
April 6, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 2 Plaintiffs' Application for Temporary Restraining Order. 1.Plaintiffs shall immediately, and no later than 12:00 p.m. on 4/7/2016, serve Defendants with copies of the Complaint, Summons, TRO application, this order, and any oth er documents filed on the district court docket, and shall file a certificate of service demonstrating that such service has been completed. 2.All parties shall thereafter appear before the undersigned at 10:00 a.m. on 4/8/2016 for a Status Conferenc e to discuss scheduling matters related to Plaintiffs TRO application. The parties are advised that such conference will not be a hearing on the merits of the application. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/6/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruben Garcia et al v. County of Santa Clara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Garcia
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Abrajan
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Aguilar
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Banks
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Benavides
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tricia Benavides
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Callaghan
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Co
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maylene De Jesus
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Fernandez
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Garcia
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Garza
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Guadalupe
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Guerreo
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puresa Jacobo
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gigi Lau
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Leon-Rodriguez
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelica Longa
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aerin Mai
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nghia Mai
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moti Marga
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristina Martinez
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Laura Murillo
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tam Nguyen
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tu Tran Nguyen
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelica Pedrozo
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Perez
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lili Phu
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosario Silva-Aguilar
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Terrazas
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Tonnu
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thucuc Tran
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Ursua
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Valdez
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Vo
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Vu-Lam
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Jennifer Lu Gilbert
Represented By: Christopher J Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Santa Clara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Employees International Union Local 521
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?