Nunes v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Plaintiff: Karen Nunes
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 5:2016cv01732
Filed: April 6, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk shall close the file. All deadlines/hearings shall be terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/13/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
November 18, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. The parties are ordered to appear on 1/19/2017 at 10:00 AM to show cause why the case should not be dismissed. On or before 1/12/2017, the parties shall file a joint statement in response. All other pretrial deadlines and hearing dates are VACATED and any pending motions are TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/18/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
May 5, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 8 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. The time within which a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint must be filed and served by Prudential is extended to June 3, 2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/5/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunes v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Nunes
Represented By: Thornton Davidson
Represented By: Robert J Rosati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Sevana Babooian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?