Hix v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Thomas Hix
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and U.S. Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2016cv01747
Filed: April 6, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE 42 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/24/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
July 20, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY HE DID NOT RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Re: Dkt. No. 31 . Hix must respond to this order by 7/22/2016. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/20/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
June 29, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AS MODIFIED GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE 24 . Updated Case Management Statement due by 9/7/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/29/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
June 3, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 10 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
May 31, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 10 (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hix v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Hix
Represented By: Shawn Robert Parr
Represented By: Lindsey Vu Pho
Represented By: Eric J. Sidebotham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?