Singh v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Plaintiff: Montie Singh
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 5:2016cv01919
Filed: April 12, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Re: Dkt. 42 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/1/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
February 16, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION, GRANTING SINGH'S MOTION TO AMEND ADMINISTRATIVE CLAIM. Re: Dkt. Nos. 9, 28 (31). Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017)
June 22, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AS AMENDED 14 . Case Management Conference continued to 9/7/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 8/31/2016. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/22/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
June 20, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND MODIFIED ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE 12 . Motion to Dismiss 9 set for 8/10/2016 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Responses due by 7/11/2016. Replies due by 7/29/2016. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/20/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montie Singh
Represented By: Steven James Brewer
Represented By: Omar I. Habbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?