GoPro, Inc. v. 360Heros, Inc.

Plaintiff: GoPro, Inc.
Defendant: 360Heros, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv01944
Filed: April 13, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2017 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY 65 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
June 16, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CLAIM CONSTRUCTION (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
April 6, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS 42 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
March 23, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
March 22, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
July 19, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 9 . Updated Case Management Statement due by 8/17/2016. Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/19/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GoPro, Inc. v. 360Heros, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GoPro, Inc.
Represented By: Mehrnaz Boroumand Smith
Represented By: Ryan T. Bricker
Represented By: James G. Gilliland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 360Heros, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?