Synchronoss Technologies, Inc. v. Funambol, Inc.

Plaintiff: Synchronoss Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: FUNAMBOL, INC.
Miscellaneous: MARK L. HOGGE, ANNE K SUTTON, NICHOLAS H. JACKSON, SONALI D MAITRA and TIMOTHY C. SAULSBURY
Case Number: 5:2016cv02026
Filed: April 20, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2017 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 104 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
April 28, 2017 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 95 Stipulated Protective Order. The parties shall adopt the Model Order's language pertaining to judicial intervention and file an amended stipulated protective order within 7 days. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
April 14, 2017 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 96 Stipulation re: Discovery of ESI. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2017)
April 6, 2017 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 93 Stipulation To Further Change Time. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 4, 2017 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 91 Stipulation To Change Time. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2017)
July 15, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 63 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
July 14, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 67 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Shailendra Maheshwari. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
June 7, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 56 Stipulation To Continue Case Management Conference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
May 18, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference 51 . Case Management Statement due by 6/8/2016. Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/18/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
April 18, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 4/18/2016. (eaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synchronoss Technologies, Inc. v. Funambol, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synchronoss Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: JOEL NATHAN BOCK
Represented By: Sarah S Eskandari
Represented By: Nicholas Hunt Jackson
Represented By: Shailendra K Maheshwari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FUNAMBOL, INC.
Represented By: Sonali Deeksha Maitra
Represented By: Lisa J. Rodriguez
Represented By: Timothy Chen Saulsbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: MARK L. HOGGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: ANNE K SUTTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: NICHOLAS H. JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: SONALI D MAITRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: TIMOTHY C. SAULSBURY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?