Adkins v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Nadine Adkins
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., Lincoln Finance Company, Pacific Monarch Resorts, Inc., Seventh Avenue, Inc., Systems & Services Technologies, Inc. and TD Bank USA, National Association
Case Number: 5:2016cv02150
Filed: April 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2017 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/15/2017 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 6/8/2017. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/11/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
April 19, 2017 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 90 Motion to Consolidate. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/19/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
August 31, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION. The parties are ordered to appear on 9/15/2016 at 10:00 a.m. to show cause why the court should not impose any and all appropriate sanctions for willful disobedience of a court order. The parties may file a response to this order demonstrating good cause why sanctions should not be imposed on or before 9/8/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/31/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
August 15, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. If Plaintiff does not, no later than 8/19/2016, either: (1) file documents to show proof of service of the Summons and Complaint on Pacific Monarch; or (2) explain in writing why service has not been accomplished, the court will dismiss Pacific Monarch. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/15/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
June 24, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Lincoln Finance Company. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/24/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adkins v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadine Adkins
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra Alford McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Finance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Monarch Resorts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seventh Avenue, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Systems & Services Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank USA, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?