Alandy v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Luis Alandy
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, Bank of America, National Association, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 5:2016cv02152
Filed: April 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/11/2017 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 5/4/2017. All other pretrial deadlines and hearing dates, including those scheduled in the Pretrial Order 64 , are VACATED and any pending motions are TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/7/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
February 6, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 58 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/6/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
November 10, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. If Plaintiff does not, by 12:00 p.m. on 11/15/2016 file or cause to be filed a case management conference statement or otherwise demonstrate good cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed, the court will dismiss t he action with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/10/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
July 27, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CHASE BANK USA, N.A., ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PROC. 41(a), granting 43 . Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 7/27/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 8, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING re 39 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC ONLY. The Clerk shall terminate Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC ONLY. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/8/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
June 16, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 30 Stipulation TO FURTHER CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT CHASE BANK USA, N.A. TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Response due 6/28/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/16/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alandy v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Alandy
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine Anne Neben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Lauren E. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Represented By: Adam Frederick Summerfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Julieta Stepanyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?