Vedanti Systems Limited v. Max Sound Corporation

Plaintiff: Vedanti Systems Limited
Defendant: Max Sound Corporation
Case Number: 5:2016cv02179
Filed: April 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 63 OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by Max Sound Corporation. Motions terminated: 38 MOTION to Set Aside Default Entry filed by Max Sound Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/16/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
November 29, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO FURTHER EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT filed by Max Sound Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/29/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
November 21, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 58 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time for Defendant to File Reply in Support of Motion to Set Aside Default filed by Max Sound Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/21/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
September 15, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Changing Briefing Schedule for Default Motion, Disqualification Motion, and Case Management Conference and Hearing Date. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 38 MOTION to Set Aside Default Entry. Responses due by 11/8/2016. Replies due by 11/17/2016. Motion Hearing set for 12/22/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 12/15/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/22/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 09/15/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2016)
July 21, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 38 MOTION to Set Aside Default Entry. Case Management Statement due by 10/20/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/21/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
June 27, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Hearing and Briefing Schedule on 34 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/27/2016. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 10, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 8 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (emclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
May 27, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Amended as to last sentence. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 27, 2016 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 23, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 157 in 5:14-cv-04412-EJD ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED. The court has reviewed the motion and determined that the cases are not related and that no reassignments shall occur. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/23/2016.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vedanti Systems Limited v. Max Sound Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vedanti Systems Limited
Represented By: David A. Barrett
Represented By: Beko Osiris Ra Reblitz-Richardson
Represented By: D. Michael Underhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Sound Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?