Martin v. DeepRock Manufacturing

Plaintiff: Michael Martin
Defendant: DeepRock Manufacturing
Case Number: 5:2016cv02182
Filed: April 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Case dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/4/2017. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2017)
September 13, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd conditionally granting 17 defense counsel's motion to withdraw. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2016)
July 26, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Plaintiff's Counsel Should Not Be Sanctioned. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/2/2016 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/26/2016. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. DeepRock Manufacturing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Martin
Represented By: Steven Whitefield Ritcheson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeepRock Manufacturing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?