Ticer v. Young et al
Plaintiff: Mark Ticer
Defendant: Gregory Young and Board of Trustees of the California State University
Case Number: 5:2016cv02198
Filed: April 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE RE 124 . Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/1/2019. ***Civil Case Terminated. (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER by Judge 10/5/2018 granting 110 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 113 . Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND ADR DEADLINE filed by Mark Ticer, Gregory Young, Board of Trustees of the California State University. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/1/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 107 Motion to File Under Seal. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 99 . STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting ENE by Mark Ticer filed by Mark Ticer, Gregory Young, Board of Trustees of the California State University, Emily Allen. Case referred to early neutral evaluation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/12/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2018)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part 86 Motion to Dismiss and Strike. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 79 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Mark Ticer, Gregory Young, Board of Trustees of the California State University. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/26/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 77 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [JOINT STIPULATION] TO EXTEND THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO FEBRUARY 27, 2018 filed by Mark Ticer, Gregory Young, Board of Trustees of the California State University. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Magistrate Kandis A. Westmore on 1/11/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ticer v. Young et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Ticer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the California State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?