Jenniffer Tanimura v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jennifer Tanimura
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., TD Bank USA, National Association and USCB, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv02224
Filed: April 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY COURT SHOULD NOT DISMISS EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. Show Cause Response due by 6/28/2017. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/14/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
April 13, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 48 , 49 MOTIONS TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Amended Pleading due by 5/4/2017. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/13/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
February 14, 2017 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SUBMITTING 60 MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT; VACATING HEARING; AND DENYING MOTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/14/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
October 6, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 30 DEFENDANT TD BANK USA, N.A.'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/6/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenniffer Tanimura v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Tanimura
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Kelsey Israel-Trummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank USA, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCB, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?