Vela et al v. County Of Monterey et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Sandra Vela, AnnaMarie Moreno and Bernadette Alverado
Defendant: County Of Monterey, Steve Bernal, John Mihu, James Bass, Erika Kaye, Carol White, Barbara Fulkerson, N. Quintero, Scott Miller, California Forensic Medical Group, Taylor Fithian and Eluid Garcia
Case Number: 5:2016cv02375
Filed: May 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Ventura
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 125 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING 129 COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND DENYING 126 CFMG DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/27/2018. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER DENYING 123 PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/2/2018.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER DENYING 95 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO JOIN RUBEN VELA AND LOUIE CABRAL, JR. AS NOMINAL DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/27/2018.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 111 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 4. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION AND ORDER REQUIRING CALIFORNIA FORENSIC MEDICAL GROUP TO PRODUCE MEDICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH RECORDS IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE (approving 107 ). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/18/2018. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 CIVIL MINUTE ORDER re Mid-Deposition Dispute by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/17/2018. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 98 THE PARTIES' STIUPLATED REQUEST FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING CFMG TO PRODUCE MEDICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH RECORDS IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/11/2017.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 82 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 1. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 88 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 2. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Setting Hearing re 88 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 2. Discovery Hearing set for 10/13/2017 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/12/2017. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 INTERIM ORDER re 71 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 1. Supplemental report due by 6/9/2017. If any remaining unresolved issues, lead counsel and anyone else whose presence is needed to fully explore resolution shall appear in person before this court on 6/14/2017, 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/1/2017. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER SUBMITTING 55 MONTEREY COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT AND VACATING FEBRUARY 9, 2017 HEARING; GRANTING MOTION IN PART WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND AND DENYING MOTION IN PART AS TO DEFENDANT MILLER; GRANTING MOTION WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND AS TO DEFENDANT BERNAL; AND DIRECTING ALL MONTEREY COUNTY DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/8/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 22 CFMG DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; GRANTING 23 DEFENDANT MILLER'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 23 DEFENDANT BERNAL'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/7/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER SUBMITTING 23 COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT; AND VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/29/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER RESETTING HEARING ON 23 COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; AND VACATING HEARING ON 22 MEDICAL DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR RESPONSE TO 25 PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO ADVANCE HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Response due by 7/5/2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/29/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vela et al v. County Of Monterey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Sandra Vela
Represented By: Joshua Piovia-Scott
Represented By: Lori Rifkin
Represented By: Dan Lewis Stormer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AnnaMarie Moreno
Represented By: Joshua Piovia-Scott
Represented By: Lori Rifkin
Represented By: Dan Lewis Stormer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadette Alverado
Represented By: Joshua Piovia-Scott
Represented By: Lori Rifkin
Represented By: Dan Lewis Stormer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Of Monterey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mihu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erika Kaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Fulkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Quintero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Fithian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eluid Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?