Arnold v. City Of San Jose et al

Plaintiff: Kathy Arnold
Defendant: City Of San Jose, Officer Huynh, Graeme Newton and Brian-Anthony Asuelo
Case Number: 5:2016cv02485
Filed: May 8, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court Order discharging prior orders to show cause and terminating 32 discovery dispute report as moot; Order to show cause re: settlement signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/23/2017. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/11/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Fifth Floor, San Jose. Show Cause Response due by 6/27/2017. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2017)
May 16, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court Order to Show Cause to Plaintiff's Counsel Re: Failure to Appear signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/16/2017. Show cause hearing set for 5/23/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Fifth Floor, San Jose. Show cause hearing re: discovery non-compliance continued to same time and place. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
May 8, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Setting Hearing re: 32 Discovery Dispute Report #2; Order to Show Cause to Plaintiff's Attorney Re: Discovery Non-Compliance. Hearing and OSC Hearing set for 5/16/2017 at 10:00 AM, Courtroom 2, Fifth Floor, San Jose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/8/2017. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
September 15, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court Order to show cause why plaintiff's claim should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/15/2016. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/20/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, Fifth Floor, San Jose. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. City Of San Jose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Arnold
Represented By: James Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of San Jose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graeme Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian-Anthony Asuelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?