Jeffrey David Grice v. Carolyn W Colvin

Plaintiff: Jeffrey David Grice
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 5:2016cv02523
Filed: May 10, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REASSIGN CASE. As all parties have now consented to the assignment of this case to a magistrate judge for all purposes including trial and entry of judgment, the Clerk shall reassign it to an available magistrate judge. The Status Conference scheduled for June 16, 2016 is VACATED. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 6/7/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
June 1, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE. Because Plaintiff did not comply with the order filed on May 23, 2016 (Dkt. No. 6 ), the court schedules this case for a Status Conference at 10:00 a.m. on June 16, 2016. The parties shall file a Joint Status Conference Statement which provides, inter alia, the information required by the May 23rd order on or before June 9, 2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/1/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
May 23, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CONSENT/DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The court orders Plaintiff to file a similar document indicating either consent or declination to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge on or before 5/27/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/23/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffrey David Grice v. Carolyn W Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey David Grice
Represented By: Omar O Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Ben A. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?