Toro v. USA

Petitioner: Jaime Arana Del Toro
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 5:2016cv02538
Filed: May 10, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 1 Section 2255 Motion as to Fourth Ground for Relief. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 28, 2017. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
September 8, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Judge Lucy Koh Denying in Part 1 Motion to Vacate and Directing Government to Obtain Declaration from Petitioner's Counsel. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2016)
June 10, 2016 2 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Directing Respondent to Answer 2255 Motion. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 06/10/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toro v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Thomas Anthony Colthurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jaime Arana Del Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?